U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. George
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Probation 12BOrder]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Probation 12BOrder]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Probation 12BOrder]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 14, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • May 03, 2021: [Memorandum]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 14, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • December 10, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 07, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 26, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 25, 2020: [Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 22, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 22, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • November 16, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order]
  • November 13, 2020: [Arrest]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Final Pretrial Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order]
  • August 30, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
  • August 30, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 30, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 30, 2019: [Administrative Closure]
  • August 30, 2019: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 30, 2019: [LASER - Notice]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 01, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 25, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • February 22, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
  • February 04, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice - Other]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 26, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 20, 2018: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • November 16, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 13, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • November 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • November 13, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 13, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.