U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00183-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ruggiero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • March 01, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 15, 2019: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • February 15, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 27, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 27, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 26, 2018: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • November 26, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 20, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 15, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 14, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.