U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00182-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Santo Benito Lara et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Mandate]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 17, 2022: [Transcript]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Appellate Case Number]
  • January 24, 2022: [Clerks Certificate/Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 24, 2022: [Appeal Cover Sheet]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 14, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Psychiatric Report]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [Amend]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Competency Order]
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • August 25, 2020: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 23, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 03, 2020: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Transcript]
  • January 09, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Filing]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 28, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 20, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 15, 2019: [Transcript]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Transcript]
  • September 24, 2019: [Transcript]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Response - not to motion]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 13, 2019: [Transcript]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Transcript]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
  • May 10, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 10, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 10, 2019: [Jury Verdict]
  • May 10, 2019: [JERS Certification of Exhibits]
  • May 10, 2019: [Court Instructions]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 10, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 08, 2019: [Jury Trial]
  • May 07, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
  • May 07, 2019: [Jury Selection]
  • May 03, 2019: [Witness List]
  • May 03, 2019: [Jury Selection List]
  • May 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 01, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 01, 2019: [In Limine]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • April 23, 2019: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 10, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 26, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Continue Trial]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 04, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 01, 2019: [Order]
  • January 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • December 18, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 06, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • November 16, 2018: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • November 15, 2018: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • November 15, 2018: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.