U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rosario
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • October 07, 2024: [Judgment - Revocation]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Transcript at Government Expense]
  • June 02, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Transcript at Government Expense]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 22, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 20, 2021: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • January 19, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • January 15, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice - Other]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 25, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 25, 2020: [Response - not to motion]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 23, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 13, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 26, 2019: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 24, 2019: [Continue Trial]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 04, 2019: [Continue Trial]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • May 10, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 03, 2019: [Continue Trial]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • January 23, 2019: [Continue Trial]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • December 03, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 03, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 16, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • November 16, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 16, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.