U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Manapsal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Collateral Returned]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Forfeiture Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • October 25, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 21, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
  • October 21, 2019: [Forfeiture]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 03, 2019: [Continue Trial]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 04, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • March 04, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • March 01, 2019: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • February 13, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 04, 2019: [Continue Trial]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
  • December 19, 2018: [Collateral Receipt]
  • December 06, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • December 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • November 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 20, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 20, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 20, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 20, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.