U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00191-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lohman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 15, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • July 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2019: [Objection - not to motion]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 02, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 08, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 17, 2019: [Addendum]
  • January 16, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • January 03, 2019: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continue Trial]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • December 13, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 04, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • November 27, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 27, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 27, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 26, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 26, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 26, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.