U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-00193-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ferreira
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 20, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • March 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 06, 2019: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • March 06, 2019: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • March 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 07, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 02, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 02, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 12, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 12, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • December 12, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • December 12, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • December 07, 2018: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • December 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.