U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00199-1
  • Case Name: USA v. De Los Santos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 16, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • February 06, 2019: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • February 06, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 18, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • January 14, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
  • January 07, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 17, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • December 17, 2018: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • December 10, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 07, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 07, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • December 07, 2018: [Case Reassigned]
  • December 07, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.