U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00200-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 19, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • April 19, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [In Chambers Conference]
  • January 03, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Administrative Closure]
  • January 03, 2020: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 03, 2020: [LASER - Notice]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 02, 2019: [Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 20, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • August 15, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 07, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continue Trial]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • May 22, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 21, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • March 21, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 15, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 15, 2019: [Trial Notice]
  • February 12, 2019: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 12, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 11, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • February 11, 2019: [Arrest]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 07, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • December 07, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.