U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00185-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stygles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Writ Returned]
  • January 16, 2020: [Writ Issued - Clerk]
  • January 15, 2020: [Writ of Garnishment - Application]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.