U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00206-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Guzman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • December 03, 2019: [Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
July, 2019
  • July 06, 2019: [Transcript]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 25, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • June 10, 2019: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • June 10, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • June 10, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 10, 2019: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • June 07, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
  • June 07, 2019: [In Limine]
  • June 03, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • June 03, 2019: [JERS Statement]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 13, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: [Motion Hearing Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 22, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 13, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • March 13, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 22, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • January 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • December 18, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • December 13, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 13, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • December 13, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.