U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00210-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Michallyszyn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Response - not to motion]
  • August 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2019: [Forfeiture Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 17, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 17, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • June 14, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 07, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 04, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 01, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 21, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2019: [Trial Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 10, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • January 08, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 07, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 27, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 26, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 21, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 19, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • December 14, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 14, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • December 14, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.