U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barton et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2020: [Dismiss]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 02, 2020: [Continue Trial]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 31, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 31, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • August 31, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 26, 2020: [Administrative Closure]
  • June 26, 2020: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 26, 2020: [LASER - Notice]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [In Chambers Conference]
  • June 18, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 24, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 21, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • February 18, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 18, 2020: [Bail Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • February 12, 2020: [Bail]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 14, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continue Trial]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 07, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 01, 2019: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • August 20, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Trial Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • June 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 28, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 28, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 27, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • June 05, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 29, 2019: [Continue Trial]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 27, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 28, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • January 23, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
  • January 10, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 27, 2018: [Motion Referred]
  • December 26, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 21, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • December 21, 2018: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 21, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 21, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.