U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lara et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • July 22, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 18, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • March 14, 2019: [Trial Notice]
  • March 14, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 14, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • March 08, 2019: [Arrest]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice - Mail Returned]
  • January 11, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.