U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00193-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stevens et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • December 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 04, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • November 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
  • November 18, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 12, 2019: [Amend]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 01, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 01, 2019: [Administrative Closure]
  • October 01, 2019: [LASER - Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 25, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
  • July 19, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 14, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 04, 2019: [Continue Trial]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 22, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • March 13, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bail]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Bail]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • January 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • January 22, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • January 16, 2019: [Trial Notice]
  • January 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 15, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 15, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
  • January 10, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 10, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.