U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McInnes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Exhibit List]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 13, 2021: [Forfeiture Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • April 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 12, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • April 07, 2021: [Objection - not to motion]
  • April 06, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 09, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • November 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 14, 2020: [Status Report]
  • October 07, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 04, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • August 30, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 23, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 09, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Continue Trial]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • April 01, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 21, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • March 11, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Trial Notice]
  • February 27, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 04, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 04, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 28, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 28, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • January 17, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 17, 2019: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • January 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.