U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Manning
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 23, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • January 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 21, 2022: [Extend Time]
  • January 05, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • August 18, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • August 06, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 06, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 06, 2021: [Witness List]
  • August 05, 2021: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 02, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Response - not to motion]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 04, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • May 04, 2021: [JERS Statement]
  • May 04, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 04, 2021: [Witness List]
  • May 03, 2021: [Continue Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Jury Selection List]
  • April 27, 2021: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • April 06, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 12, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • January 04, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • December 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 18, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • May 18, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2020: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Transcript]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 24, 2020: [Assent to Motion]
  • February 24, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 07, 2019: [Witness List]
  • November 06, 2019: [Witness List]
  • November 06, 2019: [JERS Statement]
  • November 04, 2019: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • November 01, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 28, 2019: [Continue Trial]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 21, 2019: [Continue Trial]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 01, 2019: [Continue Trial]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 18, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continue Trial]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
  • February 08, 2019: [Trial Notice]
  • February 08, 2019: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • January 24, 2019: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • January 23, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.