U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Contreras
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Collateral Return Acknowledgment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Collateral Returned]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • August 26, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • August 11, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 09, 2021: [Status Report]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 07, 2021: [Continue Trial]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 07, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • January 04, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Collateral Receipt]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 22, 2020: [Continue Trial]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 24, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 03, 2020: [Continue Trial]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Appearance Bond]
  • June 25, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [Rescheduling Motion Hearing Notice]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 02, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • May 18, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order]
  • May 14, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 11, 2020: [Reconsideration]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 11, 2020: [Witness List]
  • March 09, 2020: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • March 03, 2020: [Final Pretrial Order]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • February 27, 2020: [Witness List]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 16, 2019: [Detention Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 16, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 06, 2019: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • December 06, 2019: [Detention]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 26, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • November 15, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • November 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 05, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • October 30, 2019: [Bail]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 22, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 15, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 15, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 08, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 07, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 02, 2019: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • August 02, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 01, 2019: [Continue Trial]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • July 23, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • July 22, 2019: [Final Pretrial Order]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 11, 2019: [Addendum]
  • June 07, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • June 04, 2019: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued]
  • May 09, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 09, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 08, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 08, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 14, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • March 12, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Trial Notice]
  • February 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • January 28, 2019: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 28, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 28, 2019: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • January 28, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.