U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice - Mail Returned]
  • November 13, 2019: [Letter]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • August 12, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • April 05, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • April 05, 2019: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • April 03, 2019: [Clarify]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2019: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • March 15, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 27, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 27, 2019: [Arrest]
  • February 25, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • February 25, 2019: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • February 25, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 25, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • February 21, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 15, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • February 15, 2019: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 08, 2019: [Continue]
  • February 01, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • February 01, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • February 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.