Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00248
    Party Name:Spinelli v. U.S. Bank National Association
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Reassigned]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Recusal Order]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Appearance]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time to Answer]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Record]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?50648
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =