Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00047-10
    Party Name:USA v. Morrison et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Motion]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compel]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice - Other]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe for Summons]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe for Warrant]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Case]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Sealed Superseding]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Order]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Notice]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Order - Temporary]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing Notice]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Sealed]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?50629
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =