Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00284
    Party Name:Dutton v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Record]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time to Answer]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - ECF]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal - New Case]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?50707
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =