U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gingras
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • June 04, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 18, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Probation 12BOrder]
  • December 10, 2019: [Request for Modifying Conditions of Supervision-12B (Court Use Only)]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • May 14, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 21, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 19, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • March 19, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.