U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00204-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Waive]
  • June 06, 2019: [Waive]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 24, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • April 19, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
  • April 19, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2019: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • April 01, 2019: [Trial Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 29, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 29, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • March 21, 2019: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • March 20, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 20, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.