U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • November 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 04, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 23, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • July 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 01, 2019: [Trial Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 13, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 13, 2019: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.