open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00132-1
    Party Name:USA v. Phelps
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Reminder]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Report]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Notice]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Order - Temporary]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing Notice]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?51628
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =