open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00123-1
    Party Name:USA v. Adkins
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Reminder]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Detention]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Notice]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing Notice]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?51488
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =