open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00142-1
    Party Name:USA v. Craigue
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Reminder]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Notice]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Report]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing Notice]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe for Warrant]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Case]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?51711
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =