U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tappan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 11, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • December 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2020: [Addendum]
  • December 01, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 03, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 25, 2020: [Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 06, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 02, 2020: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 14, 2020: [Continue Trial]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 20, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Continue Trial]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • October 29, 2019: [Detention Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • October 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
  • October 22, 2019: [Detention Order - Temporary]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Bail Hearing]
  • September 24, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • September 24, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
  • September 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2019: [Trial Notice]
  • September 13, 2019: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 12, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 12, 2019: [Arrest]
  • September 06, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 06, 2019: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 06, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.