open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

NEW HAMPSHIRE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:19-11261-
    Party Name:John Thomas Baulch and Sarah J. Baulch
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Close Case and Discharge Trustee]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Automatic Closing of Bankruptcy Case (ADI)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [BNC Certificate of Notice (BK) (ADI)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Reaffirmation Agreement - Notice Regarding]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:October 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [341 Meeting of Creditors Held (ALL CHAPTERS - TRUSTEE/US TRUSTEE USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors (ADI)]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Indiv No Asset]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (ACTIVE EVENT)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?115886
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =