open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

NEW HAMPSHIRE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:19-11260-
    Party Name:Philip Caparso
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge (ADI)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Discharging Debtor CH. 7]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Amended Document -Response to Defective Amendment]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Notice of Defective Amendment]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Amended Schedules D, E/F (FEE)]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (ADI)]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Employ]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [341 Meeting of Creditors Held (ALL CHAPTERS - TRUSTEE/US TRUSTEE USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors (ADI)]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Indiv No Asset]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (ACTIVE EVENT)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?115885
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =