open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

NEW HAMPSHIRE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00942
    Party Name:Myers v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - ECF]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [MDL 2753 Case Assigned]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - New Case]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?52076
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =