open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

NEW HAMPSHIRE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00940
    Party Name:Parvin v. Golda Bella Hospitality, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Notice]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Reassigned]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Appearance]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons - Waiver Issued]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - ECF]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - New Case]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?52074
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =