U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendez-Nolasco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 14, 2019: [Combined Change of Plea and Sentencing - Re-entry After Deportation]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Expedited Plea /Sentencing Hearing - Re-entry After Deporation]
  • October 08, 2019: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 26, 2019: [Trial Notice]
  • September 24, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 24, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 23, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 20, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 20, 2019: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 20, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.