U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00224-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arsenault
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • May 18, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • May 18, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 17, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • May 14, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 12, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 10, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • May 10, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • November 19, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 23, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 02, 2020: [Continue Trial]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 22, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • July 22, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 11, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 04, 2020: [Continue Trial]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order]
  • May 15, 2020: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 12, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 04, 2020: [Continue Trial]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 09, 2019: [Continue Trial]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 20, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • November 20, 2019: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 20, 2019: [Bail Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Trial Notice]
  • November 15, 2019: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 15, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 14, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 14, 2019: [Arrest]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 14, 2019: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • November 14, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 14, 2019: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 14, 2019: [Indictment - Sealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.