U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00227-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Karvosky
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Collateral Return Acknowledgment]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Collateral Returned]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Response - not to motion]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 20, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 10, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • September 10, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 23, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order]
  • December 04, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 21, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 07, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 24, 2020: [Continue Trial]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 08, 2020: [Continue Trial]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 07, 2020: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • February 05, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 05, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 08, 2020: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • January 08, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • January 02, 2020: [Trial Reminder]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 16, 2019: [Trial Notice]
  • December 13, 2019: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2019: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • December 04, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 22, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 22, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.