U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00239-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hughes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: [Request to Dismiss Probation Petition]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 24, 2022: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • February 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice - Other]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2021: [Detention Order - Temporary]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • September 14, 2021: [Bail]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 03, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 28, 2021: [Continue Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 15, 2021: [Continue Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 08, 2021: [Continue Trial]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 15, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • January 15, 2021: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • January 14, 2021: [Continue Trial]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • November 19, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • November 19, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 17, 2020: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 10, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Bail]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 14, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 13, 2020: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • October 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Amend]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2020: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 07, 2020: [Arrest]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • August 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • August 27, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order]
  • July 27, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order]
  • June 19, 2020: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • June 08, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 05, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 19, 2020: [Motion Referred]
  • May 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order]
  • May 15, 2020: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • May 14, 2020: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • April 14, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2020: [Bail Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 03, 2020: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 14, 2020: [Continue Trial]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Trial Notice]
  • December 17, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • December 16, 2019: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 16, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 12, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • December 02, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2019: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • December 02, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.