open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

NEW HAMPSHIRE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01204
    Party Name:El et al v. Byam et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mandate]
    Date Published:July 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appellate Case Number]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Certificate]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - ECF]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?52810
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =