open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

NEW HAMPSHIRE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01208
    Party Name:Maxwell v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service Unexecuted]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service Executed]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - Mail Returned]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons - Waiver Issued]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - ECF]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?52815
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =