open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

NEW HAMPSHIRE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:19-11688-
    Party Name:Suzanne M. Drew
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Close Case and Discharge Trustee]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Automatic Closing of Bankruptcy Case (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge (ADI)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor (ADI)]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of Notice (BK) (ADI)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Reaffirmation Agreement - Notice Regarding]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (CH. 7 TRUSTEE USE - 341 FILINGS PROGRAM)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Indiv No Asset (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (CH. 7) (ACTIVE EVENT)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116334
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =