open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

NEW HAMPSHIRE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:19-11372-
    Party Name:Todd T. Waterman
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Discharging Debtor CH. 7]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Discharging Debtor CH. 7]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Vacating Order]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Vacating Order]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Close Case and Discharge Trustee]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Close Case and Discharge Trustee]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (CH. 7 TRUSTEE USE - 341 FILINGS PROGRAM)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (CH. 7 TRUSTEE USE - 341 FILINGS PROGRAM)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Certificate of Service (BK)]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Certificate of Service (BK)]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Notice of Hearing (BK)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Notice of Hearing (BK)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Relief from Stay (FEE)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Relief from Stay (FEE)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (TRUSTEE USE - 341 FILINGS PROGRAM)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (TRUSTEE USE - 341 FILINGS PROGRAM)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 Trustee FINAL Report and Account Upon Conversion]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Chapter 13 Trustee FINAL Report and Account Upon Conversion]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Schedules A/B-J]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Schedules A/B-J]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Chapter 7 Means Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Chapter 7 Means Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Declaration About Debtor Schedules - Form 106DEC]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Declaration About Debtor Schedules - Form 106DEC]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Notice (BK) (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [BNC Certificate of Notice (BK) (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Notice Upon Conversion 13/12 to 7]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Notice Upon Conversion 13/12 to 7]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [GENERIC Order]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [GENERIC Order]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Convert Case 13 to 7]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Convert Case 13 to 7]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Convert Case 13 to 7 (FEE)]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Convert Case 13 to 7 (FEE)]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Convert Case 13 to 7 (FEE)]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [BNC Certificate of Notice (BK) (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Corrective Entry - New Case Individual with dba LLC LLP Inc]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Convert Case 13 to 7]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Sever Case (CH. 13)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116004
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =