open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

NEW HAMPSHIRE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:19-11687-
    Party Name:Lauren M. Waterman
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [341 Meeting of Creditors Held (ALL CHAPTERS - TRUSTEE/US TRUSTEE USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [341 Meeting of Creditors Held (ALL CHAPTERS - TRUSTEE/US TRUSTEE USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [BNC Certificate of Notice (BK) (ADI)]
    Date Published:January 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Clerk Notice of Contingent Dismissal]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Chapter 13 Trustee FINAL Report and Account Upon Conversion]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Chapter 13 Trustee FINAL Report and Account Upon Conversion]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (BK)]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (BK)]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [List of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [BNC Certificate of Notice (BK) (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Clerk Notice of Contingent Dismissal]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Verification of Creditor Mailing List]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Declaration About Debtor Schedules - Form 106DEC]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Means Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Schedules A/B-J]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Converting Case To Chapter 7]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Sever Case]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116333
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =