open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

NEW HAMPSHIRE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:19-11692-
    Party Name:Jeffrey Sanford Ropes
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Close Case and Discharge Trustee]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Case Closed Without Discharge]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Notice of Mortgage Forbearance]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of Notice (BK) (ADI)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [GENERIC Order]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Abandonment (ADI)]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Notice of Abandonment of Property (CH. 7 ONLY)]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (ADI)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Continue Hearing (BK)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (CH. 7 TRUSTEE USE - 341 FILINGS PROGRAM)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Objection]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Relief from Stay (FEE)]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (BK)]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Individual Asset (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [SS Number Statement/Declaration]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Askenaizer, Michael S. [Voluntary Petition (CH. 7) (ACTIVE EVENT)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nhb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116338
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =