U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nembhard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 24, 2020: [Rule 20 - Transfer Out]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • March 11, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • March 11, 2020: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 11, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 06, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 06, 2020: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.