U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mancia
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • July 06, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 05, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 09, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 09, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 09, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 03, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • March 03, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 03, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.