U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jacques
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 06, 2020: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • March 06, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 06, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 05, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • March 05, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 05, 2020: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.