U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coleman
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 03, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 23, 2020: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • July 07, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 28, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 05, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 05, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 04, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • April 02, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • April 01, 2020: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 13, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 13, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.