U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robertson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • June 30, 2020: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • June 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 05, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 05, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 23, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • March 20, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • March 20, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 18, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 18, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.