U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 09, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 08, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • July 08, 2020: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • July 08, 2020: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • July 07, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 07, 2020: [Bail]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Transcript]
May, 2020
  • May 24, 2020: [Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Transcript]
  • April 20, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 26, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • March 26, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 26, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • March 25, 2020: [Arrest]
  • March 24, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 24, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.