open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

NEW HAMPSHIRE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00375
    Party Name:Bergeron v. Smith
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Appearance]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Addendum]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Cure Notice - Action Requested]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - ECF]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal - New Case]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nhd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?53784
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =